Accounts and annual returns AMY MARY BIRD WILL TRUST
Charity number: 212736

Charity reporting is overdue by 1573 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 112 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 112 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 477 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 477 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | Overdue | Overdue by 842 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Overdue | Overdue by 842 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2019 | Overdue | Overdue by 1208 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2019 | Overdue | Overdue by 1208 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2018 | Overdue | Overdue by 1573 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2018 | Overdue | Overdue by 1573 days |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window