TOWN ESTATE CHARITY

Charity number: 212748
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018
Total gross income £5.50k £5.50k £5.52k £5.88k £6.17k
Total expenditure £4.60k £4.50k £4.74k £4.73k £5.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A