ANGLO-BRAZILIAN SOCIETY

Charity number: 212861
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Christopher John Pickard Chair 02 April 2019 None on record
Peter Johan Van Veen Trustee 01 November 2017 None on record
Luciana de Oliveira Sales Berry Trustee 01 February 2018 None on record
TERESA NEMES Trustee 30 August 2012 None on record
MRS GRACA FISH Trustee None on record
JAMES O'KEEFE Trustee 03 October 2012 None on record
MR MARCIO DA SILVA Trustee None on record
SIR PETER HEAP Trustee
COMMONWEALTH COUNTRIES LEAGUE Received: On time