Trustees EARL STONHAM TRUST
Charity number: 213006
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Donna Taylor-Burman | Trustee | 30 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Turner | Trustee | 05 May 2021 |
|
|||||
Mark Gillett | Trustee | 15 December 2020 |
|
|||||
Karl Wilkinson | Trustee | 24 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Mary Budd | Trustee | 06 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Frances Mary Wicks | Trustee | 25 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
MR PHIL HURT | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.