KNARESBOROUGH OLD PEOPLES WELFARE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 213110
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £17.07k £21.79k £19.34k £17.16k £13.41k
Total expenditure £15.82k £17.07k £15.63k £17.57k £13.01k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £7.49k £0 N/A N/A