Financial history THE DEPTFORD ST PAUL CHARITY

Charity number: 213171
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £98.82k £50.02k £84.13k £41.02k £41.85k
Total expenditure £46.45k £31.53k £30.49k £31.19k £31.20k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A