Accounts and annual returns THE QUEEN VICTORIA CLERGY FUND

Charity number: 213258
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 14 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 14 February 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 02 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 02 March 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2019 13 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 13 February 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2018 25 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 25 February 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2017 27 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 27 February 2018 On time Download Open in new window