MABE VILLAGE HALL AND WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity number: 213438
Charity reporting is overdue by 6 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/01/2016 31/01/2017 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020
Total gross income £2.09k £1.69k £3.64k £2.25k £4.17k
Total expenditure £2.46k £2.36k £2.17k £2.58k £2.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A