FAITH IN FAMILIES

Charity number: 213692
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 31 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 31 July 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 21 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 27 July 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 12 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 12 September 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 21 July 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 21 July 2016 On time Download