THE NEWBURY CHURCH AND ALMSHOUSE CHARITY

Charity number: 213803
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 22 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 22 September 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 12 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 12 August 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 18 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 18 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 04 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 04 July 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 01 August 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 01 August 2016 On time Download