THE NEWBURY CHURCH AND ALMSHOUSE CHARITY

Charity number: 213803
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £131.87k £90.30k £129.64k £145.01k £109.51k
Total expenditure £94.64k £78.06k £151.56k £170.71k £113.69k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A