THE MARY CURZON CHARITY FOR WOMEN WORKERS COMMONLY KNOWN AS THE MARY CURZON HOUSING TRUST

Charity number: 213841
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2019 07 October 2020 69 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 31 July 2019 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 26 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2016 14 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2015 23 August 2016 24 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2015 Not Required