Financial history ALLEN'S CHARITY

Charity number: 213842
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £20.73k £20.98k £21.13k £23.02k £21.01k
Total expenditure £17.05k £23.60k £22.55k £20.39k £19.84k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A