Trustees ALLEN'S CHARITY

Charity number: 213842
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
REV'D SIBLEY Chair 10 October 2012
JOHN RODGMAN'S CHARITY
Received: On time
PHILLIPS CHARITY
Received: On time
LONG SUTTON CONSOLIDATED CHARITY
Received: 134 days late
PHILLIP'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Terry John York Trustee 23 May 2019
None on record
Peter John Little Trustee 26 June 2018
JOHN RODGMAN'S CHARITY
Received: On time
PHILLIPS CHARITY
Received: On time
PHILLIP'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Philip Nigel Oldfield Trustee 18 June 2018
None on record
ANNE SCARLETT Trustee 13 October 2017
None on record
SUSAN BENFELL Trustee 08 September 2016
None on record
Diane Cook Trustee 09 June 2015
CHARITY OF THOMAS BLANK
Received: On time
RUTH BARBER Trustee 10 October 2012
PUBLIC PARK AND PLEASURE AND PLAYGROUND
Received: On time
CHARITY OF JOHN SOWTER
Received: On time
LONG SUTTON CONSOLIDATED CHARITY
Received: 134 days late
PHILLIP'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
MRS D TAVNER Trustee 10 October 2012
None on record
THERESA WATTS Trustee 10 October 2012
None on record
JOHN ERIC CLAREY Trustee 10 October 2012
None on record