Trustees THE SAVE THE CHILDREN FUND

Charity number: 213890
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Tsitsi Dadirai Chawatama-Kwambana Chair 25 January 2021
SAVE THE CHILDREN INTERNATIONAL
Received: On time
Catherine Ann Doran Trustee 01 December 2022
None on record
Gordon Adrian McFarland Trustee 24 January 2022
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WOKING CHRIST CHURCH
Received: On time
GUILDFORD DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
JESSICA CATHERINE GLADSTONE Trustee 11 May 2020
ADVOCATES FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT
Received: On time
Richard Thomas George WINTER Trustee 13 January 2020
SUSSEX HOUSE SCHOOL
Received: On time
THE KEEPERS AND GOVERNORS OF THE POSSESSIONS, REVENUES AND GOODS OF THE FREE GRAMMAR SCHOOL OF JOHN LYON, WITHIN THE TOWN OF HARROW-ON-THE-HILL
Received: On time
INTERNATIONAL RESCUE COMMITTEE, U.K
Received: On time
Razia Khan Trustee 16 July 2019
None on record
Kajal Odedra Trustee 16 July 2019
None on record
Babatunde Soyoye Trustee 20 March 2018
None on record
David Ripert Trustee 04 August 2017
None on record
Dianna Patricia Melrose Trustee 23 June 2017
None on record
Arabella Elizabeth Duffield Trustee 17 February 2017
None on record
Anne Kathleen Fahy Trustee 14 October 2016
None on record
Mark Francis Swallow Trustee 25 February 2015
None on record