Dogfen lywodraethu NOTTINGHAM COMMUNITY ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
SCHEME DATED 31 MARCH 2009 AS AMENDED ON 24/02/2016 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 20 APR 2018 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 31 MAY 2019 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 20 AUG 2021
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: (A) THE PROVISION OF ALMSHOUSE ACCOMMODATION FOR BENEFICIARIES; (B) SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS AS THE TRUSTEE DECIDES; AND (C) THE PAYMENT OF ANNUITIES TO NECESSITOUS PERSONS OF GOOD CHARACTER WHO ARE RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT BUT THE TRUSTEE MUST GIVE PREFERENCE TO WIDOWS AND SPINSTERS WHO ARE RESIDENT IN THE NOTTINGHAMSHIRE AREA AT THE TIME OF APPOINTMENT.
Maes buddion
THE EAST MIDLANDS, NAMELY THE COUNTIES OF NOTTINGHAMSHIRE, LEICESTERSHIRE, NORTHAMPTONSHIRE, DERBYSHIRE, RUTLAND AND LINCOLNSHIRE.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.