GEORGE TEMPERANCE TRUST

Charity number: 214134
Charity reporting is up to date (23 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 23 November 2020 23 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 23 November 2020 23 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 03 April 2020 155 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 03 April 2020 155 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 06 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 06 February 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 06 February 2018 98 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 06 February 2018 98 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 31 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 31 October 2016 On time Download