GEORGE TEMPERANCE TRUST

Charity number: 214134
Charity reporting is up to date (23 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £34.91k £34.09k £39.39k £36.33k £37.51k
Total expenditure £42.41k £28.09k £31.42k £20.48k £58.74k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A