THE HOMFRAY TRUST

Charity number: 214503
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £8.26k £5.87k £10.06k £8.94k £7.96k
Total expenditure £9.12k £7.95k £9.60k £9.60k £8.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A