Financial history THE BRITISH DIABETIC ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 215199
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £40.64m £34.84m £38.84m £37.66m £37.88m
Total expenditure £38.89m £38.30m £39.44m £36.66m £37.44m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £153.00k £109.00k £140.00k £834.00k £1.24m
Income - Donations and legacies £33.52m £27.78m £30.80m £30.46m £30.81m
Income - Other trading activities £4.52m £4.54m £4.52m £4.11m £3.93m
Income - Charitable activities £2.37m £2.26m £3.12m £2.79m £2.91m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £236.00k £262.00k £395.00k £291.00k £230.00k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £16.76m £13.40m £15.34m £16.17m £16.51m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £29.40m £28.74m £29.14m £26.97m £27.86m
Expenditure - Raising funds £9.49m £9.56m £10.30m £9.69m £9.58m
Expenditure - Governance £179.00k £189.00k £165.00k £165.00k £199.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £6.43m £6.69m £6.63m £5.91m £6.46m
Expenditure - Investment management £69.00k £64.00k £75.00k £75.00k £60.00k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0