Accounts and annual returns VICTOR MANN TRUST FUND

Charity number: 215476
Charity reporting is up to date (105 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 13 February 2024 105 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 13 February 2024 105 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 27 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 27 October 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 20 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 24 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 24 September 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 05 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 05 August 2019 On time Download Open in new window