THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF THE QUEEN VICTORIA HOSPITAL EAST GRINSTEAD

Charity number: 215518
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 17 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 17 September 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 02 November 2020 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 02 November 2020 2 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 23 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 23 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 10 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 10 July 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 12 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 12 July 2017 On time Download