THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF THE QUEEN VICTORIA HOSPITAL EAST GRINSTEAD

Charity number: 215518
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £52.74k £55.04k £45.00k £37.87k £36.49k
Total expenditure £89.37k £78.86k £477.25k £39.23k £267.38k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A