Accounts and annual returns CHARITY OF RICHARD CRANDALL FOR THE POOR OF CHIDDINGSTONE

Charity number: 215527
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 18 March 2024 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 24 February 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 21 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 09 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 26 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required