THE WESTERN HOLSTEIN CLUB

Charity number: 215529
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £14.50k £13.24k £12.66k £10.76k £6.72k
Total expenditure £12.17k £12.15k £12.90k £12.94k £10.21k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A