BARRY AND DISTRICT MENCAP SOCIETY

Charity number: 215607
Charity reporting is overdue by 1513 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 Overdue Overdue by 52 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Overdue Overdue by 52 days
Annual return 30 September 2019 Overdue Overdue by 417 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Overdue Overdue by 417 days
Annual return 30 September 2018 Overdue Overdue by 783 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Overdue Overdue by 783 days
Annual return 30 September 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1148 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1148 days
Annual return 30 September 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1513 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1513 days