Financial history FAIRHILL ESTATE

Charity number: 215649
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £4.03k £4.03k £3.86k £4.26k £8.52k
Total expenditure £3.82k £3.82k £2.02k £3.13k £5.44k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A