Trustees FAIRHILL ESTATE

Charity number: 215649
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Raymond Miller Chair 07 May 2021
None on record
Graeme Ransom Trustee 07 February 2022
None on record
Ian Lindley Trustee 01 November 2021
None on record
Brian Cooper Trustee 04 October 2021
FRANCES HODGSON MEMORIAL FUND
Received: On time
ALSTON WITH GARRIGILL RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
Alastair Robertson Trustee 04 October 2021
None on record
Ron Robinson Trustee 04 October 2021
None on record
Paul Barry Best Trustee 07 May 2021
GARRIGILL VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
Norman Bradley English Trustee 07 May 2021
None on record
Brian Desmond Davies Trustee 07 May 2021
None on record
Steven Walter Hattersley Trustee 07 May 2021
None on record
Dr Michael Hanley Trustee 02 May 2019
None on record
Lai Heung Ho Trustee 06 March 2017
None on record
Christopher Neville Hugill Harrison Trustee 09 January 2017
None on record
ELAINE GREW Trustee 05 August 2013
FRANCES HODGSON MEMORIAL FUND
Received: On time
GARRIGILL OLD SCHOOL CHARITY
Received: On time
ALSTON WITH GARRIGILL RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
ALAN GREEN Trustee
ALSTON GOODS SHED TRUST
Overdue by 1565 days