Accounts and annual returns CHARITY OF WILLIAM AYLETT (ESTATE TRUSTEES)

Charity number: 215855
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 13 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 02 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 31 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 31 August 2019 123 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2017 03 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required