Financial history ELLIS DAVIES FOR THE POOR

Charity number: 215923
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £894 £737 £985 £944 £1.02k
Total expenditure £1.02k £1.31k £1.33k £1.45k £675
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A