Financial history THE LUCY MARRIOTT AID-IN-SICKNESS FUND

Charity number: 215959
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £2.03k £2.08k £2.13k £2.18k £2.21k
Total expenditure £99 £58 £104 £42 £360
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A