Financial history WHITEHAVEN TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 216064
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £398.77k £243.57k £582.34k £579.55k £284.82k
Total expenditure £641.51k £599.15k £717.51k £740.10k £664.82k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £56.60k £9.81k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £391.52k £376.86k N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £60.17k £77.71k N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A £119.34k £113.74k N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A £11.30k £11.25k N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £5.71k £136.05k N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £477.87k £444.18k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £0 £8.95k N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £4.90k £6.50k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £239.64k £286.98k N/A