Financial history THE BRITISH ACADEMY OF FILM AND TELEVISION ARTS

Charity number: 216726
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £14.96m £22.45m £20.52m £17.74m £17.01m
Total expenditure £14.11m £15.32m £15.78m £11.74m £13.13m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A £23.12k £21.05k £7.30k
Income from government grants £7.50k £7.50k £9.50k £39.50k £266.26k
Income - Donations and legacies £273.00k £7.13m £5.38m £6.95m £4.02m
Income - Other trading activities £7.64m £7.83m £7.03m £4.68m £5.49m
Income - Charitable activities £6.78m £7.25m £7.74m £5.96m £5.67m
Income - Endowments £0 £5.58m £2.42m £3.65m £13.00k
Income - Investment £75.00k £46.00k £66.00k £41.00k £27.00k
Income - Other £194.00k £194.00k £306.00k £109.00k £1.80m
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £7.84m £8.76m £9.13m £7.14m £7.50m
Expenditure - Raising funds £6.27m £6.56m £6.64m £4.60m £5.63m
Expenditure - Governance £168.00k £222.00k £181.00k £238.00k £299.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £10.00k £3.69k £2.00k £2.00k £2.00k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0