THE CHARITY OF ELIZABETH WILLIAMS

Charity number: 216903
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 06 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 03 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 09 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 03 December 2018 306 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 25 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required