Trustees THE GRANT, BAGSHAW, ROGERS AND TIDSWELL FUND
Charity number: 216948
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Janet Sillifant | Trustee | 09 April 2024 |
|
|||
Kathleen Amelia Roche | Trustee | 28 March 2023 |
|
|||
Robert John Poole | Trustee | 09 April 2019 |
|
|||
PATRICIA CANSFIELD | Trustee | 13 November 2018 |
|
|||
VALERIE DOWLING | Trustee | 13 November 2018 |
|
|||
RAYMOND REDFERN | Trustee | 08 April 2014 |
|
|||
STUART KEENAN | Trustee | 09 January 2013 |
|
|||
JENNY HOPE | Trustee |
|
||||
MR NEVILLE WARD | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.