THE REDBOURN CHARITIES

Charity number: 217154
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £64.11k £68.42k £71.26k £74.57k £78.42k
Total expenditure £38.07k £33.26k £42.73k £52.52k £45.12k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A