RAVENSTONE WITH SNIBSTONE VILLAGE INSTITUTE

Charity number: 217951
Charity reporting is up to date (115 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2020 25 March 2021 115 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2019 13 February 2020 75 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2018 13 February 2020 440 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2017 13 February 2020 805 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2016 24 February 2017 86 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2016 Not Required