RAVENSTONE WITH SNIBSTONE VILLAGE INSTITUTE

Charity number: 217951
Charity reporting is up to date (115 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/01/2016 31/01/2017 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020
Total gross income £14.13k £15.76k £16.45k £14.59k £22.84k
Total expenditure £9.04k £11.47k £14.93k £10.92k £11.31k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A