RAVENSTONE WITH SNIBSTONE VILLAGE INSTITUTE

Charity number: 217951
Charity reporting is up to date (115 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
TRACEY KATRINA BATES Trustee 18 May 2013 None on record
MRS MARY ABBOTT Trustee None on record
Jemima Elizabeth Wade Trustee 12 November 2012 None on record
jon abbott Trustee None on record
Gemma Newbold Trustee 08 June 2017 None on record
Robert John White Trustee 14 January 2016 None on record
MARY COURTENEY DANAHER Trustee 18 May 2013 None on record
ANGELA REYNOLDS Trustee 18 May 2013 None on record
Susan North Trustee 13 May 2015 None on record
Marilyn Joy White Trustee 11 October 2019 None on record