Rugby Welfare Charities

Charity number: 217987
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2021 31 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2020 05 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2019 07 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2018 02 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2017 05 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 Not Required