RUGBY RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY

Charity number: 217987
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/05/2016 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020
Total gross income £3.36k £3.48k £4.54k £4.57k £4.62k
Total expenditure £3.45k £3.51k £3.46k £5.31k £4.74k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A