ST SWITHUN'S CHURCH OR MISSION HALL

Charity number: 217994
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev ANNE MARGARET STRATTON Chair
BELPER IN DUFFIELD UNITED CHARITIES Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF BELPER, ST.PETER Received: On time
MARGARET OLWEN BROWN Trustee 23 March 2015 None on record
KEITH WOLLERTON Trustee 08 June 2018
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF BELPER, ST.PETER Received: On time
PHILIP JOHN THOMAS Trustee 08 September 2013
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF BELPER, ST.PETER Received: On time
SUSAN MARIE ALLEN Trustee 01 September 2013
HOPE FOR BELPER Received: 23 days late
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF BELPER, ST.PETER Received: On time
BRENDA MARY BOCOCK Trustee 08 September 2020
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF BELPER, ST.PETER Received: On time
David Tony Skelton Trustee 08 September 2020
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF BELPER, ST.PETER Received: On time