AGE CONCERN,SEAFORD

Charity number: 218379
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 COVID filing extension granted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 COVID filing extension granted
Annual return 30 September 2019 11 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 13 January 2020 167 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 06 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2016 17 November 2017 110 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Not Required