AGE CONCERN,SEAFORD

Charity number: 218379
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £21.37k £17.68k £15.02k £10.70k £17.94k
Total expenditure £28.68k £25.64k £26.15k £10.31k £19.41k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £13.67k