ROBERT WRIGHT CHARITY

Charity number: 218449
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £3.25k £3.23k £3.06k £3.08k £3.03k
Total expenditure £1.01k £1.00k £762 £800 £1.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A