Trustees FRIENDS OF THE HOSPITAL OF ST CROSS
Charity number: 218485
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Douglas Jones | Chair | 10 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN JOHN CHENEY | Trustee | 12 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Brian Cheney | Trustee | 10 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH BURNETT | Trustee | 11 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Walshaw | Trustee | 14 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ramesh Mohan Lal Srivastava | Trustee | 09 November 2015 |
|
|||||
William Goldschmidt | Trustee | 09 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
JUNE WITCOMB | Trustee | 09 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
TRACEY ANNE LENNARD | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.