Financial history WHEATHAMPSTEAD WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity number: 218934
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022
Total gross income £4.87k £15.13k £5.75k £800 £1.01k
Total expenditure £4.77k £23.28k £4.60k £1.30k £2.31k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A