BUXTON COTTAGES

Charity number: 219033
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £40.72k £41.68k £43.23k £43.81k £45.46k
Total expenditure £43.84k £33.58k £113.17k £46.60k £56.05k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A