Financial history LLANDAFF WAR MEMORIAL FUND

Charity number: 219060
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £4 £5 £11 £12 £0
Total expenditure £11 £11 £11 £10 £11
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A