CHARITY OF ALBERT OF FLOWERDEW

Charity number: 219156
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/01/2017 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020 31/01/2021
Total gross income £42 £45 £46 £47 £48
Total expenditure £30 £45 £0 £18 £16
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A